SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1046413
Charity reporting is overdue by 813 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £5.61k £1.65k £5.40k £878 £970
Total expenditure £5.34k £1.32k £4.34k £770 £817
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A