THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS' CHURCH, DERSINGHAM

Charity number: 1046540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.13k £3.54k £3.02k £3.06k £3.15k
Total expenditure £1.40k £0 £10.38k £0 £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A