Accounts and annual returns NORTH KESTEVEN SCHOOL FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1046611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 May 2022 320 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 May 2022 685 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required