HORDER HEALTHCARE

Charity number: 1046624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Richard John Tyler BA MA PhD Trustee 07 March 2017 None on record
Rosemary Cunningham Thomas Trustee 25 January 2018
THE BRITISH DIABETIC ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Dr Catherine Elisabeth Dorcas Bell CB MA PHd Trustee 27 October 2016 None on record
Jennifer Caroline Grover Trustee 06 June 2019 None on record
Dr David William Yates Trustee 25 January 2018
THE TUNBRIDGE WELLS POST GRADUATE CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
John William Turner Trustee 25 January 2018 None on record
PETER ALAN FLAMANK FCA CPFA Trustee 01 May 2013 None on record
Steven Louis Dance MA MBACDir Chair 29 September 2016 None on record
Amanda Louise Parker Trustee 25 January 2018 None on record