Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF HARROGATE BRIGANTES CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1046738
Charity reporting is overdue by 78 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £42.65k £73.13k £25.21k £16.73k £22.34k
Total expenditure £23.60k £19.76k £26.53k £23.23k £10.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A