Accounts and annual returns BRYNITHEL YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1046870
Charity reporting is overdue by 1694 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 30 November 2019 Overdue Overdue by 598 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Overdue Overdue by 598 days
Annual return 30 November 2018 Overdue Overdue by 964 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Overdue Overdue by 964 days
Annual return 30 November 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1329 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1329 days
Annual return 30 November 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1694 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1694 days