FRIENDS OF FERNWOOD JUNIOR SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold fund raising activities eg Disco's, Summer Fayre, Quiz Nights etc to raise money to buy extra equipment for school that is not paid for out of the budget for example and adventure playground and 'Trim Trail' for the children to play on.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 02 June 1995: Standard registration
- 19 October 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 19 October 2010: Funds transferred to 1110407 FERNWOOD JUNIOR SCHOOL CHILDRENS ACCOUNT
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2004 | 30/08/2005 | 30/08/2006 | 30/08/2007 | 30/08/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.96k | £18.04k | £16.59k | £8.93k | £6.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.54k | £11.68k | £14.52k | £2.18k | £5.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2008 | 11 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2008 | 19 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 August 2007 | 24 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2006 | 05 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2006 | 05 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 August 2005 | 21 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2005 | 21 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED 3 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window