Trustees WEST SUSSEX COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1046955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL HAMMOND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tom Dalton | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Wright | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Woolard | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hills | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Miles Price | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Swayne | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Connor Holmes | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES TRIMMING | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HOPPER | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN MITCHISON | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.