Trustees ADVENTIST DEVELOPMENT AND RELIEF AGENCY - TRANS EUROPEAN DIVISION

Charity number: 1046997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pastor Raafat Kamal Chair
None on record
KAREN HOLFORD Trustee 08 December 2016
None on record
Dr DANIEL DUDA Trustee 01 September 2015
NEWBOLD COLLEGE
Received: On time
Dr PATRICK JOHNSON Trustee 01 September 2015
NEWBOLD COLLEGE
Received: On time
Nenad Jepuranovic Trustee 01 September 2013
WORLD WIDE ADVENT MISSIONS LIMITED
Overdue by 116 days
NEWBOLD COLLEGE
Received: On time
CLAIR SANCHES-SCHUTTE Trustee 29 May 2012
None on record
Audrey Andersson Trustee 24 May 2011
None on record