Trustees THE INSTITUTION OF RAILWAY SIGNAL ENGINEERS
Charity number: 1046999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yousef Kimiagar | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Ewart | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Andrew Brammer | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeetendra Gautamchand Dhelaria | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Pequignot Gracey | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Hartwell | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Copperthwaite | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Robert Page | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Stringer | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Bik Shun Lam | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lord Cooke | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Clive Roberts | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harvinder Singh Bhatia | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Firas Al-Tahan | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Upton | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Roderick Muttram | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Allison | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul McSharry | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bogdan Godziejewski | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Xiaolu Rao | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Power | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Andrew Allan | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Knight | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Walter Boshier | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bridges | Trustee | 25 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.