THE PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF EDWARD WORLLEDGE JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1047086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 May 2018 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required