THE PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF EDWARD WORLLEDGE JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1047086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.16k £4.83k £5.96k £6.76k £3.98k
Total expenditure £3.68k £709 £3.46k £7.46k £7.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A