THE FRIENDS OF ASHBY ST. LEDGERS CHURCH

Charity number: 1047114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 March 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 12 March 2021 401 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 14 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required