THE FRIENDS OF ASHBY ST. LEDGERS CHURCH

Charity number: 1047114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £1.65k £1.98k £1.76k £1.41k £1.14k
Total expenditure £109 £60 £4.07k £1.60k £398
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A