PICKNALLS FIRST SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Picknalls PTA raises funds to benefit each and every child in the school through a variety of events such as Christmas and Summer Fayre, discos, film shows, tea parties, activity days, themed evenings, bring and buy sales in addition to raffles and sposnsored events.Funds are used to provide essential and supplementary educational resources as well as equipment for extra curricular activites.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 12 June 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER ELIZABETH FORRESTER | Chair | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Laura Anne Hobbs | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Juliet Tinto | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNE TAPP | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.78k | £2.72k | £7.42k | £5.77k | £7.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.24k | £2.77k | £6.61k | £4.79k | £7.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 MAY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF PICKNALLS FIRST SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL,RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PICKNALLS FIRST SCHOOL
OLDFIELDS ROAD
UTTOXETER
ST14 7QN
- Phone:
- 01889228700
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window