PEMBROKESHIRE LOCAL ACTION NETWORK FOR ENTERPRISE AND DEVELOPMENT LIMITED

Charity number: 1047268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARBARA ANN PRIEST Trustee
PEMBROKESHIRE ASSOCIATION OF VOLUNTARY SERVICES
TEMPLETON COMMUNITY HALL TRUST Recently registered
ELIZABETH RAWLINS Trustee 03 June 2016
THE LLANGWM VILLAGE COMMUNITY CENTRE Received: On time
MR GORDON BARRY Trustee 31 January 2012 None on record
ANDREW GILL DIXON Trustee 31 January 2012 None on record
Gareth David Reynolds Trustee 09 July 2019 None on record
Dr David Hendy Worrall Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
Gareth Davies Trustee 09 July 2019 None on record
THOMAS JOHN PRICE Trustee None on record
ELIZABETH LYNNE UPSDELL Chair 16 January 2014 None on record