SURREY SINFONIETTA (COMMUNITY MUSIC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of educational and therapeutic services related to music. including concerts, recitals and workshops in schools, hospitals, institutional accommodation and general public. Music services to community groups and societies. Organising local amateur music groups and societies. The Charity provides music workshop days for school age students (South London Music Days)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 June 1995: Standard registration
- CAMERATA OF LONDON (Working name)
- SURREY SINFONIETTA (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER RICHARD GEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.70k | £0 | £4.48k | £5.96k | £6.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.57k | £0 | £4.45k | £5.66k | £6.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2021 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MUSIC IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISION OF CONCERTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE CROYDON, SURREY, KENT AND GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 BIRDHURST AVENUE
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 7DX
- Phone:
- 02086889166
- Email:
- hilarydennis@live.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window