Accounts and annual returns THE CHAILEY CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1047289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window