Financial history THE CHAILEY CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1047289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £477.38k £21.02k £21.10k £21.72k £12.20k
Total expenditure £542.95k £18.92k £26.00k £16.47k £9.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A