Derbyshire Japanese School

Charity number: 1047319
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHINICHI YAMASHITA Trustee 31 January 2018 None on record
TOSHIAKI SAITO Trustee 24 March 2014 None on record
Koji Karasawa Trustee 28 March 2018 None on record
Tomoyuki Komagome Trustee 29 January 2014 None on record
YUICHI HIROSHIMA Trustee 31 January 2018 None on record
KENJI ISHIMINE Trustee 31 January 2018 None on record
KIYOTAKE SHIBATA Trustee 31 January 2018 None on record
Ryuji Sakai Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Kazuaki Okada Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Shoji Toda Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Shingo Yanai Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Ryota Sugii Trustee 28 March 2018 None on record
SHIGERU TERAMOTO Chair 29 January 2014 None on record
TAKESHI ADACHI Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
TAKESHI KOZAI Trustee None on record
TOMOYUKI KAMURA Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
TAKASHI SEKIGUCHI Trustee 16 June 2015 None on record