BACK TO WORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Back to Work exists to give special help and advice to vulnerable and disadvantaged people over the age of 40, who are in financial need or suffering ill health through unemployment, to find work and to give them their dignity and lives back. Back to Work Centre is based in Victoria, London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 June 1995: Standard registration
- 06 December 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BACK TO WORK FOR THE OVER 40'S (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.33k | £62.21k | £54.15k | £52.65k | £52.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.19k | £63.33k | £55.44k | £50.24k | £53.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 14 June 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 09 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 09 July 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 23 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 02 August 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 05 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 20 September 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 24 APRIL 1995 AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 8 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE OVER THE AGE OF 40 WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ILL HEALTH AS A RESULT OF THEIR UNEMPLOYMENT BY HELPING THEM TO OBTAIN A JOB
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window