Accounts and annual returns ASHFIELD PLAY CARE SCHEME

Charity number: 1047469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 14 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 25 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 14 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 September 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 09 September 2019 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 01 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 01 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window