Accounts and annual returns HOLGATE PRIMARY & NURSERY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1047480
Charity reporting is overdue by 1155 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 59 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 59 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 February 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2022 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 January 2022 358 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1155 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required