KNAPHILL AND ST JOHN'S OPERATIC GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Presents one major production of a Light Opera each year, plus other smaller productions in the furtherance of the advance of public education of the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 June 1995: Standard registration
- KASJOG (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Lewis | Chair | 06 June 2024 |
|
|||||
DAVID SAUNDERS | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Anthony Bryan Crow | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DAVID DOWDING | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adriana Gielbert | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allan John Wright | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA JILL DOWDING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.32k | £90 | £16.99k | £18.00k | £18.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.75k | £348 | £16.79k | £17.83k | £17.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 30 OCTOBER 2006. as amended on 03 Jul 2023 as amended on 03 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PERFORMANCE OF OPERA AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE WOKING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Greenacre
Knaphill
WOKING
Surrey
GU21 2JR
- Phone:
- 01483475858
- Email:
- secretary@kasjog.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window