Trustees KNAPHILL AND ST JOHN'S OPERATIC GROUP
Charity number: 1047524
Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michael Anthony Bryan Crow | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Helena Newman | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DAVID DOWDING | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adriana Gielert | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allan John Wright | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ANN ROSSON | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA JILL DOWDING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.