Accounts and annual returns THE ROBERT HAMER EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1047549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 16 February 2025 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2023 05 August 2024 278 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 02 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 15 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required