Trustees RISEDALE COMMUNITY COLLEGE FUND
Charity number: 1047649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Col Charlie Anderson | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Morley | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hastings | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Knight | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Beveridge | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terry McCann | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lara Vinsen | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN SCOTT | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carl LES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN GLAHOME | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.