RALEIGH INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1047653
Charity is insolvent

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raleigh International is a sustainable development charity. We harness the passion and energy of young people to effect positive change. Our programmes focus on providing access to safe water and sanitation, protecting vulnerable environments and building resilient communities. We operate in partnership with communities, non-governmental organisations and governments in 5 countries and in the UK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Costa Rica
  • Nepal
  • Nicaragua
  • Scotland
  • Tanzania

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 June 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MOTIVE8 (Working name)
  • RALEIGH INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR Khalid Kosser MBE Chair 30 March 2017
None on record
Francesca Oberti Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Astha Wagle Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
VIRGINIA CATERINA STUART-TAYLOR Trustee 24 June 2021
KING EDWARD VI SCHOOL SOUTHAMPTON
Received: On time
Phoebe Louise Hanson Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Nicholas Peter Bartlett Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
Fatuma Abdi Mohamud Trustee 28 June 2018
None on record
Lucy Emma Slack Trustee 28 June 2018
None on record
Charles Lansley Joseland Trustee 28 June 2018
None on record
Jack Newnham Trustee 16 June 2016
None on record
Choong Fai CHAN Trustee 03 December 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.98m £8.62m £7.63m £7.30m £3.89m
Total expenditure £8.07m £8.61m £7.41m £6.72m £5.02m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £4.44m £3.10m £2.42m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.80m £3.06m £3.17m £4.16m £1.66m
Income - Other trading activities £159.00k £37.00k £23.00k £0 £23.27k
Income - Charitable activities £5.00m £5.52m £4.44m £3.10m £2.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.00k £2.00k £6.00k £5.00k £2.20k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £37.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.77m £8.30m £7.13m £6.47m £4.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £304.00k £304.00k £274.00k £257.00k £168.56k
Expenditure - Governance £23.00k £19.00k £19.00k £45.00k £35.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Own use assets £284.00k £172.00k £81.00k £98.00k £55.39k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.08m £1.98m £2.16m £2.50m £1.41m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.17m £954.00k £811.00k £591.00k £589.04k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023
Annual return 31 December 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022
Annual return 31 December 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021
Annual return 31 December 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020
Annual return 31 December 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THIRD FLOOR
DEAN BRADLEY HOUSE
52 HORSEFERRY ROAD
LONDON
SW1P 2AF
Phone:
02071831270