Accounts and annual returns ACTIVE NATION UK LTD

Charity number: 1047742
Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 48 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 48 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 May 2022 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 May 2022 115 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window