I.K. FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1047808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 June 2021 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 March 2020 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 March 2018 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1417 days