HOLBEACH ST MARKS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1047880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £4.77k £6.50k £3.34k £3.79k £2.58k
Total expenditure £6.94k £3.12k £6.37k £4.25k £4.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A