TY HAFAN

Charity number: 1047912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 December 2016 On time Download