TY HAFAN

Charity number: 1047912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.92m £9.15m £10.38m £9.47m £8.51m
Total expenditure £9.89m £9.25m £9.58m £9.50m £9.39m
Income from government contracts £329.89k £347.31k £331.43k £468.92k £443.91k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £28.04k £41.62k £45.46k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.09m £3.55m £4.75m £4.05m £3.31m
Income - Other trading activities £5.12m £4.94m £4.87m £4.58m £4.39m
Income - Charitable activities £329.89k £347.31k £360.54k £511.94k £489.37k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £385.30k £315.55k £394.59k £325.62k £324.69k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £897.46k £1.02m £1.74m £1.61m £803.84k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.30m £4.17m £4.40m £4.66m £4.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.58m £5.08m £5.18m £4.83m £4.81m
Expenditure - Governance £99.91k £111.92k £107.65k £96.08k £106.78k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £39.51k £60.36k £68.48k £67.01k £73.80k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0