THE ROBERT HAMER LLANBEDR CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1047943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.98k £8.70k £29.59k £10.96k £7.97k
Total expenditure £48.85k £4.09k £1.49k £3.58k £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A