Accounts and annual returns JEWISH CARE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1048105
Charity reporting is overdue by 308 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 308 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 308 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 February 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required