Accounts and annual returns THE APRIL CENTRE

Charity number: 1048143
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Overdue by 92 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Overdue by 457 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Overdue by 457 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 821 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 821 days
Annual return 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1188 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1188 days
Annual return 28 February 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1553 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1553 days