FRIENDS OF MARY ROSE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1048183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.05k £12.88k £8.27k £15.75k £21.58k
Total expenditure £10.09k £5.58k £5.37k £12.03k £7.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A