Financial history AGE UK WALTHAM FOREST

Charity number: 1048212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £254.64k £372.96k £505.60k £543.43k £777.19k
Total expenditure £212.60k £261.33k £354.66k £464.90k £657.10k
Income from government contracts £32.47k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £59.40k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £175.88k £122.45k £195.29k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £18.07k £14.96k £3.25k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £311.20k £405.89k £577.27k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £88 £134 £1.13k
Income - Other N/A N/A £362 £0 £250
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £50.00k £8.29k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £343.25k £453.86k £644.28k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £11.42k £11.03k £12.82k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £13.14k £8.64k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0