TYA UK CENTRE OF ASSITEJ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASSITEJ UK is part of ASSITEJ International and provides information through newsletters and networking opportunities through meetings and conferences to unite theatres,organisations and individuals of the world dedicated to theatre for children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 July 1995: Standard registration
- TYA UK (Working name)
- ASSITEJ UK (Previous name)
- THE ASSOCIATION OF PROFESSIONAL THEATRE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (INCORPORATING THE BRITISH CENTRE OF ASSITEJ) (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Thomas Crossan | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Summerfield | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Sved | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Mullan | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iona Fleur Carys Johnson | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Barr | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Eileen McLaughlin | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Kate Finch Gilmour-Wills | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Desjardins | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katerina Mary Selina Pushkin | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Belinda McElhinney | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jane Hollander | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Eibhlin de Barra | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jon Dafydd-Kidd | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.66k | £8.50k | £3.75k | £24.55k | £5.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.41k | £10.41k | £3.61k | £29.62k | £3.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/05/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/1995 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE DRAMATIC ARTS. TO ADVOCATE AND ADVANCE GOOD PRACTICE AND HIGH STANDARDS WITHIN THE FIELD OF THEATRE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Alibi Theatre
Emmanuel Hall
Emmanuel Road, St Thomas
Exeter
EX4 1EJ
- Phone:
- 01392 217 315
- Email:
- info@tya-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window