WARRINER SCHOOL FARM TRUST

Charity number: 1048302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sebastian Peissel Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
CHRISTOPHER IAN HOLLOWAY Trustee 01 September 2006 None on record
Roger Gardiner Trustee 08 November 2018 None on record
Alasdair Nicolson Lowe Trustee 14 April 2015 None on record
Dr ANNABEL KAY Chair 08 December 2011 None on record