Financial history SINGLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1048331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £56.25k £63.24k £68.33k £54.93k £75.09k
Total expenditure £68.40k £53.86k £55.73k £49.41k £57.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £40.28k £16.00k