ST MARY'S ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL (SELBY) SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1048339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.97k £4.22k £10.95k £6.53k £4.62k
Total expenditure £4.36k £2.43k £8.17k £6.28k £4.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A