Accounts and annual returns GREAT LONGSTONE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1048410
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 December 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required