Financial history GREAT LONGSTONE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1048410
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £21.78k £9.39k £15.02k £8.53k £12.51k
Total expenditure £25.81k £6.59k £9.40k £11.74k £3.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.50k N/A £1.50k N/A £10.00k