Trustees GREAT LONGSTONE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1048410
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS ELIZABETH WENDY LONG Chair
None on record
Philip James Barrett Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Kevin Crawford Trustee 10 July 2017
None on record
SUSAN JOY COOPER Trustee 08 March 2016
None on record
PETER THOMPSON Trustee 27 April 2012
HOLME MEAL CHARITY
Received: On time
SUSAN KREIT Trustee 16 April 2012
None on record
Julia Morgans Trustee 12 March 2000
GREAT LONGSTONE PRE-SCHOOL
Received: 223 days late
HILARY CLARKE Trustee 12 March 1990
None on record
DOREEN NICHOLSON Trustee 12 March 1990
None on record
JANE LITTLEFIELD Trustee
None on record