Trustees 1ST CHINEHAM SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1048634

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Edwin Phillip Circuit | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Jamie Lee Andrews | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Gibbons | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Wilson | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Altynay Cooper | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Evans | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Howard | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Handford | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Stringer | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Strickland | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.