Accounts and annual returns THE BRISTOL COMMONWEALTH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1048637
Charity reporting is up to date (107 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 February 2024 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 February 2024 107 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window