Financial history THE BRISTOL COMMONWEALTH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1048637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £44.56k £57.16k £53.23k £72.42k £64.70k
Total expenditure £45.90k £51.17k £43.81k £45.18k £50.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £16.94k