Trustees THE BRISTOL COMMONWEALTH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1048637
Charity reporting is up to date (107 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr KAY BARNARD Chair 14 September 2012
THE BURDEN NEUROLOGICAL INSTITUTE LIMITED
Overdue by 137 days
Christopher Eddison-Cogan Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
Dr Thomas Frewin Trustee 13 August 2021
None on record
Sibusiso Tshabalala Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
Janis Purdy Trustee 30 April 2016
None on record
Michael Barnard Trustee 30 April 2016
None on record
Christopher Serle Trustee 30 April 2015
None on record
Robin Danny Elms Trustee 30 April 2014
None on record
JANET KIRK Trustee 07 September 2011
None on record