Financial history WESTON SUNBEAMS

Charity number: 1048667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £11.19k £17.79k £9.44k £7.81k £177
Total expenditure £54.97k £51.63k £84.37k £42.71k £44.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A